Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Ignacio de Benavente y del Castillo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

Titular Bishop of Thespiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1790Born
11 Mar 181525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
2 Nov 186474.6SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
27 Mar 186575.0ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
27 Mar 186575.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thespiae
2 Jul 186575.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thespiae
31 Jul 188393.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ignacio de Benavente y del Castillo
Bishop Pedro Ignacio de Benavente y del Castillo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 549
  • b: LB, 6 Feb 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017