Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Chachapoyas

Dioecesis Chachapoyasensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 2 June 1843
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Piura
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 21,659 (8,365 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Jiron Ayacucho 1008, Apartado 69, Chachapoyas, Peru
  • Telephone: (41)47.77.94; 47.74.56
  • Fax: 77.70.04

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Maynas
28 May 1803ErectedDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Diocese of Cuenca
Archdiocese of Lima
Diocese of Popayán
Diocese of Quito
Diocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Maynas (erected)
Diocese of Chachapoyas
2 June 1843Name ChangedDiocese of Maynas Diocese of Chachapoyas
5 February 1900Territory LostDiocese of Chachapoyas Prefecture Apostolic of San León del Amazonas (erected)
5 April 1908Territory LostDiocese of Chachapoyas
Diocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Cajamarca (erected)
11 January 1946Territory LostDiocese of Cajamarca
Diocese of Chachapoyas
Vicariate Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón
Prefecture Apostolic of San Francisco Javier (erected)
7 March 1948Territory LostDiocese of Chachapoyas Territorial Prelature of Moyobamba (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Chachapoyas
19507,322,0007,500,00097.6%19221348,666918021ap1951
195994,00095,00098.9%23234,0861121ap1960
1970110,000120,00091.7%191205,5002721ap1971
1976162,000180,00090.0%1331610,12533113ap1977
1980175,000194,00090.2%127199,21083519ap1981
1990228,000254,00089.8%218297,86297521ap1991
1999260,000280,00092.9%1962510,40066021ap2000
2000266,000280,00095.0%1642013,30046021ap2001
2001267,000281,00095.0%1752212,13656023ap2002
2002268,200282,50094.9%2052510,72856323ap2003
2003308,076338,91090.9%1952412,83655623ap2004
2004307,570349,51288.0%2142512,30255923ap2005
2006311,000343,00090.7%2532811,10735622ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 29 Jun 2013