Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Germán Benavides Morriberón

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1920Born
25 Mar 194424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tacna, Peru
28 Aug 195838.4AppointedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
26 Oct 195838.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
30 Nov 196848.7ResignedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
30 Nov 196848.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mades
30 Nov 196848.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arequipa, Peru
19 Mar 197656.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Mades
19 Mar 197656.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Arequipa, Peru
1 Jun 198565.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Germán Benavides Morriberón
Bishop José Germán Benavides Morriberón (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotahuasi

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018