Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Pascuál Francesco Farfán de los Godos

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1870Born
23 Dec 189424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cuzco, Peru
6 Aug 190736.7AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
15 Dec 190737.1Ordained BishopBishop of Huaraz, Peru
23 Jan 190837.2InstalledBishop of Huaraz, Peru
19 Apr 191847.4AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
18 Sep 193362.9AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
17 Sep 194574.9DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro Pascuál Francesco Farfán de los Godos
Archbishop Pedro Pascuál Francesco Farfán de los Godos (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuzco

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,721
  • b: LB, 7 Feb 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018