Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Guillén y Salazar, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cajamarca, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1869Born
20 Dec 189425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
21 Dec 193364.0AppointedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
20 May 193464.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
13 Sep 193767.7DiedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan José Guillén y Salazar
Bishop Juan José Guillén y Salazar C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Cajamarca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiraflores

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018