Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Miguel Irazola y Galarza, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ucayali

Titular Bishop of Flavias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1869BornElorrio, Spain
28 Jan 191343.4AppointedPrefect of Ucayali, Peru
14 Jul 192555.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
14 Jul 192555.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ucayali, Peru
7 Feb 192656.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias
1939²69.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Ucayali, Peru
12 Jul 194575.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ucayali, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Miguel Irazola y Galarza:
Bishop Francisco Miguel Irazola y Galarza O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ucayali

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014