Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Rubén Berroa y Bernedo

Deceased

Bishop of Ica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1876BornOmate
23 Dec 189923.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 192246.4AppointedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
4 Mar 192346.9Ordained BishopBishop of Huánuco, Peru
24 Nov 194670.6AppointedBishop of Ica, Peru
12 Jul 195882.3DiedBishop of Ica, Peru

MicroData Summary for Francisco Rubén Berroa y Bernedo:
Bishop Francisco Rubén Berroa y Bernedo (born , died ) Bishop of Ica

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,492

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014