Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrose (Tancredi Alfred) Agius, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Philippines

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1856Born
8 Sep 187114.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Oct 188125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Sep 190447.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
5 Sep 190447.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Philippines
18 Sep 190448.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
12 Dec 191155.2DiedApostolic Delegate to Philippines

MicroData Summary for Ambrose (Tancredi Alfred) Agius
Archbishop Ambrose (Tancredi Alfred) Agius O.S.B. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Philippines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlexandria, Diocese of Malta
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila
Buried Place (Current)San Beda College, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1904, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast