Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Jordan Carroll

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Metellopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1862Born
15 Jun 188926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
20 Oct 190845.8AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
14 Feb 190946.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
26 Oct 191249.8ResignedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
26 Oct 191249.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
4 Apr 191350.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for James Jordan Carroll
Bishop James Jordan Carroll (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEast Port, PA, USA

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,909, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast