Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick John Ryan

Deceased

Archbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1831BornCloneyharp, Ireland
8 Sep 185221.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
15 Feb 187241.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
15 Feb 187241.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tricomia
14 Apr 187241.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tricomia
29 Jan 188452.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Salamis
8 Jul 188453.4AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
20 Aug 188453.5InstalledArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Feb 191180.0DiedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick John Ryan:
Archbishop Patrick John Ryan (born , died ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 352, and Page 452
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 491, and Page 565

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014