Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Crane

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Curium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1863Born
15 Jun 188925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
20 Aug 192157.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
20 Aug 192157.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Curium
19 Sep 192158.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curium
26 Dec 192865.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Crane
Bishop Michael Joseph Crane (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAshland, PA

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018