Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph McCort

Deceased

Bishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1860BornPhiladelphia
14 Oct 188323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Jun 191252.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Jun 191252.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
17 Sep 191252.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
27 Jan 192059.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Oct 192060.7SucceededBishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Apr 193676.2DiedBishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph McCort:
Bishop John Joseph McCort (born , died ) Bishop of Altoona

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 62
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 49, and Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013