Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmond Francis Prendergast

Deceased

Archbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1843BornClonmel, Ireland
17 Nov 186522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
5 Dec 189653.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
5 Dec 189653.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Scilium
24 Feb 189753.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scilium
29 May 191168.1AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Feb 191874.8DiedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Edmond Francis Prendergast:
Archbishop Edmond Francis Prendergast (born , died ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 504

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013