Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Frederick Bryan Wood

Deceased

Archbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1813Born
7 Apr 183622.9Converted
25 Mar 184430.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
9 Jan 185743.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Jan 185743.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Antigonea
26 Apr 185743.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antigonea
5 Jan 186046.6SucceededBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
12 Feb 187561.7AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
20 Jun 188370.1DiedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary
James Frederick Bryan Wood
Archbishop James Frederick Bryan Wood
(born , died )
Archbishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, PA, Diocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio
Death PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 106, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025