Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tobias Mullen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Germanicopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1818Born
1 Sep 184426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Mar 186849.9AppointedBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
2 Aug 186850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
15 Sep 189981.5RetiredBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
30 Sep 189981.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
22 Apr 190082.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Tobias Mullen (VIAF: 169150507)
Bishop Tobias Mullen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Erie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrney, Diocese of Derry, Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Cathedral, Pittsburgh, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 262, and Page 285
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017