Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Pittsburgh

Dioecesis Pittsburgensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • David Allen Zubik, Bishop
  • William John Waltersheid, Auxiliary Bishop
  • William Joseph Winter, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 11 August 1843
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Philadelphia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Pennsylvania
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 10,594 (4,092 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: III (NJ, PA)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: PIT
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diopitt.org/
  • Mailing Address: 111 Boulevard of the Allies, Pittsburgh, PA 15222-1618
  • Telephone: (412)456-3131
  • Fax: 456-3197

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 August 1843ErectedDiocese of Philadelphia Diocese of Pittsburgh (erected)
29 July 1853Territory LostDiocese of Pittsburgh Diocese of Erie (erected)
11 January 1876Territory LostDiocese of Pittsburgh Diocese of Allegheny (erected)
1 July 1889Territory AddedDiocese of Allegheny (suppressed) Diocese of Pittsburgh
30 May 1901Territory LostDiocese of Harrisburg (Counties of Lycoming and Center)
Diocese of Pittsburgh (Counties of Cambria, Blair, Bedford, Huntingdon, and Somerset)
Diocese of Altoona (erected)
10 March 1951Territory LostDiocese of Pittsburgh Diocese of Greensburg (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950805,6992,659,23530.3%7262519778243173,370412ap1951
1966924,0882,306,11240.1%5992848831,0464545,092316ap1967
1970924,8932,327,77139.7%5363238591,0764255,013321ap1971
1976949,1462,264,07141.9%6022838851,072253893,088321ap1977
1980912,9592,271,00040.2%5752438181,116253873,000321ap1981
1990839,0702,163,08438.8%5941917851,068262492,184309ap1991
1999755,4591,995,32037.9%5001256251,20818471,764218ap2000
2000754,1271,964,83238.4%4961236191,218531591,707218ap2001
2001753,1471,939,65638.8%4831206031,249541581,587216ap2002
2002793,4171,975,37340.2%4691225911,342501611,538215ap2003
2003812,0781,967,49441.3%4531235761,409501581,458215ap2004
2004815,7191,966,06741.5%4421185601,456491571,418215ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014