Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Henry Ackerman, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Covington, Kentucky


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1903BornPittsburgh, PA
28 Aug 192623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
6 Apr 195652.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Diego, California, USA
6 Apr 195652.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
22 May 195652.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares
4 Apr 196056.6AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
17 May 196056.7InstalledBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
28 Nov 197875.2RetiredBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
18 Nov 199289.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Covington, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Henry Ackerman:
Bishop Richard Henry Ackerman C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Covington

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013