Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Kendrick Williams

Bishop Emeritus of Lexington, Kentucky


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1936 BornAthertonville
25 May 196326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
15 Apr 198447.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
15 Apr 198447.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Catula
19 Jun 198447.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catula
14 Jan 198851.4AppointedBishop of Lexington, Kentucky, USA
2 Mar 198851.5InstalledBishop of Lexington, Kentucky, USA
11 Jun 200265.8ResignedBishop of Lexington, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for James Kendrick Williams:
Bishop James Kendrick Williams (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lexington

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lexington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013