Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Anthony Hughes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Covington, Kentucky


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1921BornYoungstown
6 Apr 194624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
23 Jul 197452.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
23 Jul 197452.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Inis Cathaig
12 Sep 197452.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Inis Cathaig
13 Apr 197957.5AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
8 May 197957.6InstalledBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
4 Jul 199573.7RetiredBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
7 Feb 201391.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Covington, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for William Anthony Hughes:
Bishop William Anthony Hughes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Covington

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 8 Feb 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015