Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James William Malone

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Youngstown, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1920BornYoungstown
26 May 194525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
2 Jan 196039.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
2 Jan 196039.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Alabanda
24 Mar 196040.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alabanda
29 Jan 196645.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
2 May 196848.2AppointedBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
20 Jun 196848.3InstalledBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
5 Dec 199575.7RetiredBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
9 Apr 200080.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Youngstown, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for James William Malone:
Bishop James William Malone (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Youngstown

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 21
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013