Catholic-Hierarchy DC

James Cardinal Gibbons

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1834BornBaltimore
30 Jun 186126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Mar 186833.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA
3 Mar 186833.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
16 Aug 186834.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
1 Nov 186834.3InstalledVicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA
30 Jul 187238.0AppointedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
20 Oct 187238.2InstalledBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
29 May 187742.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
29 May 187742.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
3 Oct 187743.2SucceededArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
7 Jun 188651.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 188752.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
24 Mar 192186.7DiedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for James Gibbons:
James Cardinal Gibbons (born , died ) Archbishop of Baltimore

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 52.6 years
  • a cardinal for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 75, and Page 140
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 323, and Page 482
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1886

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014