Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick James Donahue

Deceased

Bishop of Wheeling, West Virginia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1849BornLittle Malvern, Great Britain
19 Dec 188536.7Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
22 Jan 189444.8AppointedBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
8 Apr 189445.0Ordained BishopBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
4 Oct 192273.5DiedBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick James Donahue:
Bishop Patrick James Donahue (born , died ) Bishop of Wheeling

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 598

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013