Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph Swint

Deceased

Bishop of Wheeling, West Virginia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1879BornPickens, WV
23 Jun 190424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
22 Feb 192242.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
22 Feb 192242.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
11 May 192242.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
11 Dec 192243.0AppointedBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
12 Mar 195474.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
23 Nov 196282.9DiedBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Swint:
Archbishop John Joseph Swint (born , died ) Bishop of Wheeling

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013