Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Charles Boyle

Deceased

Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1873Born
2 Jul 189824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
16 Jun 192147.6AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
29 Jun 192147.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Dec 195077.2DiedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Hugh Charles Boyle
Bishop Hugh Charles Boyle (born , died ) Bishop of Pittsburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJohnstown, PA

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 9 Oct 2019

Quantcast