Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Richard McDevitt

Deceased

Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1858Born
14 Jul 188527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
10 Jul 191657.9AppointedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Sep 191658.1Ordained BishopBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Nov 193577.3DiedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Philip Richard McDevitt
Bishop Philip Richard McDevitt (born , died ) Bishop of Harrisburg

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1916, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast