Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Frederik Schott

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Eluza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1907BornPhiladelphia, PA
15 Jul 193527.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 195648.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
1 Mar 195648.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Eluza
1 May 195648.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eluza
11 Mar 196355.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Frederik Schott:
Bishop Lawrence Frederik Schott (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Harrisburg

  • a priest for 27.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015