Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Ready

Deceased

Bishop of Columbus, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1893BornNew Haven, CT
14 Sep 191825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
11 Nov 194451.6AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
14 Dec 194451.7Ordained BishopBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
4 Jan 194551.7InstalledBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
2 May 195764.1DiedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Ready:
Bishop Michael Joseph Ready (born , died ) Bishop of Columbus

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013