Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Timothy McNicholas, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1877Born
10 Oct 190123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Jul 191840.5AppointedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
8 Sep 191840.7Ordained BishopBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
15 Nov 191840.9InstalledBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
18 May 192547.4AppointedBishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
8 Jul 192547.5AppointedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
22 Apr 195072.3DiedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for John Timothy McNicholas
(VIAF: 4497812; WikiData: Q6260049)
Archbishop John Timothy McNicholas O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cincinnati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilmaugh, Diocese of Achonry, Ireland
Ordained PriestSomerset, OH, Diocese of Columbus, Ohio
Ordained BishopSanta Maria sopra Minerva, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceCincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1918, Number 43
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 396, Ascendance
  • c1: CB, 14 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024