Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Anthony Walsh, M.M. †

Deceased

Superior General of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America

Titular Bishop of Syene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1867BornCambridge, MA, USA
20 May 189225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
29 Jun 191144.3AppointedSuperior General of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
20 Apr 193366.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Syene
29 Jun 193366.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Syene
14 Apr 193669.1DiedSuperior General of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America

MicroData Summary for James Anthony Walsh:
Bishop James Anthony Walsh M.M. (born , died ) Superior General of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013