Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Henry Albers

Deceased

Bishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1891Born
17 Jun 191625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
16 Dec 192938.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
16 Dec 192938.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lunda
27 Dec 192938.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lunda
26 May 193746.1AppointedBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
1 Dec 196574.7DiedBishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Henry Albers
Bishop Joseph Henry Albers (born , died ) Bishop of Lansing

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCincinnati

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,929, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast