Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Joseph Reicher

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Austin, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1890BornPiqua, OH
6 Dec 191828.4Ordained PriestPriest of Galveston, Texas, USA
29 Nov 194757.4AppointedBishop of Austin, Texas, USA
14 Apr 194857.8Ordained BishopBishop of Austin, Texas, USA
15 Nov 197181.4RetiredBishop of Austin, Texas, USA
23 Feb 198493.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Austin, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Joseph Reicher:
Bishop Louis Joseph Reicher (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Austin

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 28
  • opd/c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 27 Feb 2015