Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Simon Garriga

Deceased

Bishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1886Born
2 Jul 191125.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
20 Jun 193650.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
20 Jun 193650.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Syene
21 Sep 193650.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Syene
15 Mar 194962.7SucceededBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
21 Feb 196578.7DiedBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Mariano Simon Garriga
Bishop Mariano Simon Garriga (born , died ) Bishop of Corpus Christi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort Isabel

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1936, Number 63
  • opd: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018