Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Corpus Christi

Dioecesis Corporis Christi



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • William Michael Mulvey, Bishop
  • Edmond Carmody, Bishop Emeritus
  • René Henry Gracida, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 23 March 1912
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Galveston-Houston
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Texas
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 29,690 (11,467 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the Counties of Aransas, Bee, Brooks, Dubal, Jim Hogg, Jim Wells, Kleberg, Kenedy, Live Oak, Nueces, Refugio, San Patricio, Webb, Zapata, and parts of LaSalle and McMullen in the State of Texas.
  • Conference Region: X (AR, OK, TX)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: CC
  • Catholic Communications Network: http://www.GoCCN.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box 2620, Corpus Christi, TX 78403-2620; 620 Lipan Street, Corpus Christi, TX 78401
  • Telephone: (361)882-6191
  • Fax: 882-1018

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Brownsville
28 August 1874ErectedDiocese of Galveston Vicariate Apostolic of Brownsville (erected)
Diocese of Corpus Christi
23 March 1912ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Brownsville (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese) Diocese of Corpus Christi (erected)
10 July 1965Territory LostDiocese of Corpus Christi Diocese of Brownsville (erected)
13 April 1982Territory LostDiocese of Corpus Christi
Diocese of Galveston-Houston
Archdiocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Victoria in Texas (erected)
3 July 2000Territory LostDiocese of Corpus Christi (Webb, Zapata, Jim Hogg, and half of La Salle County)
Archdiocese of San Antonio (Maverick, Zavala, Dimmit and half of La Salle County)
Diocese of Laredo (erected)
29 December 2004Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Corpus Christi (from San Antonio)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Corpus Christi
191382,400116,85070.5%352,35473ce
1950454,000646,15470.3%58891473,0884041372ap1951
1966185,187483,57738.3%68831511,22618247361ap1967
1970423,211.0%2626520406237ap1971
1976200,733527,00038.1%67811481,35629637372ap1977
1980166,000552,00030.1%80781581,050149722676ap1981
1990345,240683,56050.5%91641552,227448230083ap1991
1999363,000863,24242.1%105601652,200743627384ap2000
2000250,770555,83445.1%86431291,943337919066ap2001
2001250,000548,19845.6%95471421,760637919366ap2002
2002250,000547,19645.7%94431371,824627718865ap2003
2003328,447547,41160.0%98431412,329645817465ap2004
2004384,308549,01270.0%103411442,668676416167ap2005
2006388,878555,54070.0%114321462,663653711468ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.3, 14 Dec 2012; data: 20 Dec 2012