Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Ernest Flores

Bishop of Brownsville, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1961 BornPalacios, TX
30 Jan 198826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
28 Oct 200645.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
28 Oct 200645.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cozyla
29 Nov 200645.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cozyla
9 Dec 200948.2AppointedBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA
2 Feb 201048.4InstalledBishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Ernest Flores:
Bishop Daniel Ernest Flores (born ) Bishop of Brownsville

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brownsville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2006
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,286
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015