Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry John Paul Joseph Nussbaum, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan

Note/Previous Titular See: (Paul Joseph of the Five Wounds)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1870BornPhiladelphia, PA
20 May 189423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
4 Apr 191342.6AppointedBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
20 May 191342.7Ordained BishopBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
8 Jun 191342.8InstalledBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
22 Apr 192049.6ResignedBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
22 Apr 192049.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
14 Nov 192252.2AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
24 Jun 193564.8DiedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry John Paul Joseph Nussbaum:
Bishop Henry John Paul Joseph Nussbaum C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1913, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013