Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph O’Connor

Deceased

Bishop of Newark, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1855BornNewark
22 Dec 187722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
20 May 190145.9AppointedBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
25 Jul 190146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
20 May 192771.9DiedBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph O’Connor:
Bishop John Joseph O’Connor (born , died ) Bishop of Newark

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 419
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013