Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles André Anthonis

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1822BornAnvers
20 Dec 184523.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 186845.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
16 Mar 186845.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
3 May 186845.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
6 Dec 189370.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Charles André Anthonis:
Bishop Charles André Anthonis (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1894
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 223
  • c1+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014