Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jordan Marie Joseph Ballsieper, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eastern Bengal, India

Titular Bishop of Thennesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1835Born
15 Aug 185923.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Oct 186428.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Jul 186731.5Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Apr 187842.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Bengal, India
5 Apr 187842.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thennesus
12 May 187842.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thennesus
Apr 1886³50.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Bengal, India
1 Mar 189054.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eastern Bengal, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jordan Marie Joseph Ballsieper
Bishop Jordan Marie Joseph Ballsieper O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eastern Bengal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElberfeld, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 544
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • c1+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018