Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Libert Hubert Jean Louis Boeynaems, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA

Titular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1857Born
10 May 187719.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
11 Sep 188124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
6 Apr 190345.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA
6 Apr 190345.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
25 Jul 190345.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
13 May 192668.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA

MicroData Summary for Libert Hubert Jean Louis Boeynaems
Bishop Libert Hubert Jean Louis Boeynaems SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnvers, Belgium

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 603
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1903, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast