Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Thomas Montgomery

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of San Francisco, California, USA

Titular Archbishop of Axomis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1847Born
20 Dec 187931.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
26 Jan 189446.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
26 Jan 189446.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thmuis
8 Apr 189446.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thmuis
6 May 189648.3SucceededBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
20 Jun 189648.4InstalledBishop of Monterey-Los Angeles, California, USA
17 Sep 190254.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
17 Sep 190254.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Axomis
10 Jan 190759.0DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of San Francisco, California, USA

MicroData Summary for George Thomas Montgomery (VIAF: 255025254)
Archbishop George Thomas Montgomery (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Lawrence, KY, Diocese of Louisville, Kentucky
Ordained BishopSte. Marie, Cathedral, San Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 136, and Page 276
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 392, and Page 550
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017