Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Helena

Dioecesis Helenensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • George Leo Thomas, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 7 March 1884
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Montana
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 134,426 (51,922 Square Miles)
  • Description: Lewis and Clark, Teton, Flathead, Lincoln, Missoula, Sanders, Powell, Granite, Ravalli, Deer Lodge, Silver Bow, Jefferson, Broadwater, Gallatin, Madison, Lake, and Beaverhead Counties plus parts of Meagher, Musselshell, and Toole Counties.
  • Conference Region: XII (AK, ID, MT, OR, WA)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: HEL
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesehelena.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box 1729, 515 North Ewing St., Helena, MT 59624-1729
  • Telephone: (406)442-5820
  • Fax: 442-5191

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Montana
5 March 1883ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Idaho and Montana
Vicariate Apostolic of Nebraska
Vicariate Apostolic of Montana (erected)
11 March 1883Territory AddedArchdiocese of Saint Louis Vicariate Apostolic of Montana (Current part of the state of Montana East of the Rockies)
Diocese of Helena
7 March 1884ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Montana Diocese of Helena (erected) (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
18 May 1904Territory LostDiocese of Helena Diocese of Great Falls (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Helena
195065,000242,00026.9%100411414601433453ap1951
196679,532322,80024.6%137161535192620057ap1967
197075,500322,80023.4%115171325713020156ap1971
197665,514342,47219.1%1181613448832610261ap1977
198064,500385,00016.8%117171344817258160ap1981
199065,984424,00015.6%901110165316117953ap1991
199966,500424,37215.7%8611976852616158ap2000
200066,500483,43513.8%77118875528125858ap2001
200167,500483,43514.0%78108876734114858ap2002
200267,803509,43913.3%786848073594658ap2003
200367,693509,43913.3%757828253494057ap2004
200449,927506,0009.9%706766563383558ap2005
200658,780525,00011.2%736797442893858ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 29 May 2013