Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Frederick Cunningham

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1900BornWalkerville, MT
12 Jun 192625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Syracuse, New York, USA
5 Apr 195049.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
5 Apr 195049.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
8 Jun 195049.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
16 Jun 196766.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
4 Aug 197069.7SucceededBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
9 Nov 197675.9RetiredBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
22 Feb 197978.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for David Frederick Cunningham:
Bishop David Frederick Cunningham (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: CB, 15 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013