Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Michael Gilmore

Deceased

Bishop of Helena, Montana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1893Born
25 Jul 191522.3Ordained PriestPriest of Helena, Montana, USA
16 Dec 193542.7AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
19 Feb 193642.9Ordained BishopBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
2 Apr 196269.0DiedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA

MicroData Summary
Joseph Michael Gilmore
Bishop Joseph Michael Gilmore
(born , died )
Bishop of Helena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint Helena, Cathedral, Helena, Diocese of Helena, Montana
Death PlaceSan Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California
Buried Place (Original)Resurrection, Cemetery, Helena, Diocese of Helena, Montana

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1936, Number 9
  • c1: CB, 15 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025