Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edwin Vincent O’Hara

Deceased

Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1881BornLanesboro, OR
9 Jun 190523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
1 Aug 193048.9AppointedBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
28 Oct 193049.1Ordained BishopBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
5 Nov 193049.2InstalledBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
15 Apr 193957.6AppointedBishop of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
29 Jun 195472.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
24 Aug 195675.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
11 Sep 195675.0DiedBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Edwin Vincent O’Hara:
Archbishop Edwin Vincent O’Hara (born , died ) Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013