Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence James McNamara

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1928Born
30 May 195324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
10 Jan 197849.4AppointedBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
28 Mar 197849.6Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
14 Oct 200476.1RetiredBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
17 Dec 200476.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence James McNamara
Bishop Lawrence James McNamara (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grand Island

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018