Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Sullivan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1920BornHorton, KS
23 Sep 194424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oklahoma City and Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
25 Jul 197252.1AppointedBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
19 Sep 197252.2Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
21 Sep 197252.2InstalledBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
27 Jun 197757.0AppointedBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
17 Aug 197757.1InstalledBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
22 Jun 199373.0RetiredBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
11 Feb 200180.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Sullivan:
Bishop John Joseph Sullivan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kansas City-Saint Joseph

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013