Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Grand Island

Dioecesis Insulae Grandis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 11 April 1917
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Omaha
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Nebraska
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 103,560 (40,000 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: IX (IA, KS, MO, NE)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: GI
  • Official Web Site: http://www.gidiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: 2708 Old Fair Rd., Grand Island, NE 68803
  • Telephone: (308)382-6565
  • Fax: 382-6569

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Kearney
8 March 1912ErectedDiocese of Omaha Diocese of Kearney (erected)
13 May 1916Territory AddedDiocese of Omaha (Arthur, Wheeler, Greeley, and Howard Counties) Diocese of Kearney
Diocese of Grand Island
11 April 1917Name ChangedDiocese of Kearney Diocese of Grand Island

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Grand Island
195030,432296,07610.3%84387349223953ap1951
196648,766290,00016.8%92294518222595ap1967
197049,234298,70016.5%83285579217659ap1971
197652,150297,48517.5%73275695490ap1977
198051,846299,30017.3%73275691290ap1981
199051,953316,00016.4%838362519889ap1991
199953,967290,42918.6%80806749843ap2000
200055,447298,02718.6%69698039883ap2001
200156,879295,17619.3%66668619883ap2002
200255,206295,17618.7%66668369882ap2003
200354,549295,17618.5%65658399882ap2004
200457,460295,17619.5%63639127336ap2005
200658,200303,50019.2%60609707049ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.3, 14 Dec 2012; data: 19 Dec 2012