Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Green Bay

Dioecesis Sinus Viridis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • David Laurin Ricken, Bishop
  • Robert Joseph Banks, Bishop Emeritus
  • Robert Fealey Morneau, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3 March 1868
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Milwaukee
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Wisconsin
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 27,775 (10,728 Square Miles)
  • Description: Brown, Calumet, Door, Florence, Forest, Kewaunee, Langlade, Manitowoc, Marinette, Oconto, Outagamie, Portage, Shawano, Waupaca, Waushara, and Winnebago Counties.
  • Conference Region: VII (IL, IN, WI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: GB
  • Official Web Site: http://www.gbdioc.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery, P.O. Box 23825, 1910 S. Webster Ave., Green Bay, WI 54305-3825
  • Telephone: (920)437-7531
  • Fax: 435-1330

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 March 1868ErectedDiocese of Milwaukee Diocese of Green Bay (erected)
3 May 1905Territory LostDiocese of Green Bay
Diocese of La Crosse
Diocese of Superior (erected)
22 December 1945Territory LostDiocese of Green Bay
Diocese of La Crosse
Archdiocese of Milwaukee
Diocese of Madison (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950213,953535,37740.0%2351433785662951,429174ap1951
1966314,136730,00043.0%3511915425793741,599192ap1967
1970309,945726,89042.6%3471965435703091,355193ap1971
1976325,722728,51244.7%30419249665672901,091193ap1977
1980337,139746,00045.2%27519246772134285965223ap1981
1990365,022845,00043.2%24713838594873207865214ap1991
1999388,150898,05043.2%2351433781,0268144672199ap2000
2000394,365898,05043.9%2061363421,15386179646198ap2001
2001388,093924,03242.0%2001363361,15587179622191ap2002
2002375,708951,15939.5%1981353331,12892179621188ap2003
2003381,472930,41941.0%2011303311,152104173603185ap2004
2004358,211930,41938.5%1921153071,166108156653185ap2005
2006369,556998,80037.0%1891133021,223127151593169ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 13 Jan 2014; data: 16 Jan 2014