Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Peter Rhode

Deceased

Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1871³Born
17 Jun 189422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
27 May 190836.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
27 May 190836.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Barca
29 Jul 190836.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barca
5 Jul 191543.7AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
3 Mar 194573.4DiedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Peter Rhode
Bishop Paul Peter Rhode (born , died ) Bishop of Green Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWejherowo Neustadt, Poland

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 79
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast