Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Maria Koudelka

Deceased

Bishop of Superior, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1852BornChlistov, Austria
8 Oct 187522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
29 Nov 190755.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
29 Nov 190755.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
25 Feb 190855.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
4 Sep 191158.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
6 Aug 191360.7AppointedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
24 Jun 192168.5DiedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Maria Koudelka:
Bishop Joseph Maria Koudelka (born , died ) Bishop of Superior

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013